Directions: Directions: Using the digits 1 to 9 at most one time each, fill in the boxes to make the product as close to 7,000 as possible

### Hint

### Hint

Estimate – what can you multiply to get close to 7,000?

### Answer

### Answer

One answer is 96 x 73 = 7,008

Source: Paolo Tolomeo

My students discovered another correct response! 92×76 = 6,992

I can only find the answer 6,992 too

(3*2)+(4*8)

98×71=6958

96×74=7,104 that the close i can get.👍

I got 92×76=6,992

I got 91 times 77= 7007

You can’t use the 7 twice

why can’t she?

The directions said each digit should be used at MOST one time.

My student came up with 92 X 76 = 6992

I came up with 96 x 73 = 7008

89 x 76 = 6764 that’s only 236 away!

Found your post interesting to read. I can’t wait to see your article.

Good Luck for the upcomingupdate. Thiss article is truly quite interesting

and effective.

Best regards,

Balle Griffin

I got 6912 (72 x 96)

use the digits 1 to 9, at most one time each, to make 5 prime numbers.

I used 89×76 and got 6,764

89×76=6,764

Brianna Harb

90×77= 6930

Brianna came out with this answer.

i got 76 times 91=6916.

97 X 73 =7081

96 X 78=7,400

91 x 78 = 7016.

77×91=7007

75

*

93

——

6,975

We found 95*74=7030