Directions: Using the digits 0 to 9 at most one time each, place a digit in each box to create a true equation.

### Hint

What two-digit numbers would be too low/high that when multiplied together would not make a three-digit product?

### Answer

There are many possible true equations including 32 x 15 = 480 and 52 x 15 – 630.

Source: Robert Kaplinsky

Hewwo

These are the solutions my fifth graders in Wisconsin came up with:

59×12=708

26×35=910

27×34=918

Would 52×15 actually be a solution? My students noticed there was a 5 in each factor, which would be using two number twice. 🙂